Accounts and annual returns CYCLADES PRESERVATION FUND

Charity number: 1175248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 January 2020 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 December 2019 47 days late Download Open in new window