Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BALCOMBE
Charity number: 1175472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David John King | Chair | 24 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Oliver James Faux Jackson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Wilson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY CLARK THOMPSON | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Deck | Trustee | 06 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mitchell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mostyn David Field | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JACKY HALL | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ETHERIDGE | Trustee | 22 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
DENISE VICKERSTAFF | Trustee | 22 April 2012 |
|
|||||
RACHEL FIELD | Trustee | 17 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rosy Telford | Trustee | 20 May 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.