Trustees ENGLISH4ALL IN LEEDS
Charity number: 1175775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICK CONIBEAR | Chair | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Fox | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrzej Tucholski | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lai | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre McKenna | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Snee | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marina Idiatulina | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne McCaffrey | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Holman | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hossain Saeedi | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Milada Walkova | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Cheng | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Young | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Raper | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CARLA LOSS | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ZSOFIA PELYVA | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.