ROTHWELL DISTRICT LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1176472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANICE DAVIS Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Susan Bulmer Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
RUSSELL JOHN LEARY Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Phillip Walker Trustee 13 March 2019 None on record
Simon Bulmer Trustee 22 October 2019 None on record
WAYNE HOYLE Trustee 01 July 2018
ROTHWELL ROLLERS Received: On time
WINDMILL COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LTD Received: On time
PETER JOHN DAVIS Chair 01 July 2018 None on record
ALAN HEDLEY Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Elaine Farrer Trustee 21 April 2020 None on record