Financial history CHATSWORTH HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 511149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.20m £14.99m £14.79m £14.79m £7.44m
Total expenditure £13.22m £16.12m £13.56m £13.93m £10.08m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £865.27k
Income - Donations and legacies £531.00k £495.00k £451.07k £436.65k £404.23k
Income - Other trading activities £2.80m £3.78m £3.82m £3.90m £2.19m
Income - Charitable activities £9.02m £9.91m £9.73m £9.43m £4.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £855.00k £813.00k £794.22k £792.95k £538.98k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £228.89k £242.19k
Income - Legacies £531.00k £495.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.36m £11.23m £10.57m £11.94m £9.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.21m £1.24m £1.87m £1.93m £476.16k
Expenditure - Governance £104.00k £119.00k £114.00k £97.39k £81.99k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £95.00k £89.00k £87.82k £92.10k £94.77k
Expenditure - Other £3.65m £3.66m £1.12m £57.19k £58.26k