Trustees PHYSIONET FOUNDATION CIO
Charity number: 1175932

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Lambert Kaye | Chair | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Stevens | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Owen Netsel | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
MILTON ALLAN FRARY | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Nigel Lyon | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Russell Rollings | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gordon Thompson | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carl Peter Anderson Stitt BA, CPA | Trustee | 26 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Harry Franks | Trustee | 26 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.