Trustees THORNE RURAL LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Charity number: 1175388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLARENCE WRAITH | Chair | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Terence Wilcox | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Prime | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Whiteley | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Prime | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Carol Hammond | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Prime | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Auriol Henton | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARRY MICHAEL GOFORTH | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DOUGLAS WHITELEY | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ELAINE WRAITH | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.