Accounts and annual returns RABBANIAH ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1176290
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 September 2020 17 September 2021 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2020 17 September 2021 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 September 2019 03 September 2021 425 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2019 03 September 2021 425 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 September 2018 14 June 2021 710 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2018 14 June 2021 710 days late Download Open in new window