Trustees INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN MARITIME ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1176633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matthias Thomas Robert Ristau | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Albert Hildebrand Penninga | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Wall Baade | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Martin Rosenblum | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jeffrey Huseby | Trustee | 15 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Stevens Nestlehutt | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW DAVID GIBSON WRIGHT | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fr Bruno Ciceri | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.