Accounts and annual returns CARE & CONSIDERATION WITH A SMILE
Charity number: 1178369
Charity reporting is overdue by 1473 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 12 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 12 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 378 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 378 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 July 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 743 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 July 2022 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1108 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1473 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window