BERKHAMSTED CASTLE TRUST

Charity number: 1176286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Carol Grace Johnson Trustee 14 November 2018
GRAHAM GREENE BIRTHPLACE TRUST Received: On time
SALTER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Sarah Lundell Caradec Trustee 12 November 2018 None on record
Professor Jonathan Morris Trustee 12 January 2019 None on record
Louise Garrod Trustee 12 November 2018 None on record
Patrick James Hurndall Emery Trustee 10 February 2019 None on record
MR KEN WALLIS Trustee 14 December 2017
BERKHAMSTED ARTS TRUST Received: On time
BERKHAMSTED LOCAL HISTORY AND MUSEUM SOCIETY Received: On time
Richard Charles Thompson Trustee 12 November 2018 None on record
Peter Brian Matthews Trustee 04 March 2019
THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S GREAT BERKHAMSTED Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, GREAT BERKHAMSTED Received: On time
BARRY MICHAEL - KNOWN AS BILL WILLETT Trustee 14 December 2017 None on record
Adrian Antony Barham Chair 14 December 2017
BERKHAMSTED LOCAL HISTORY AND MUSEUM SOCIETY Received: On time
DACORUM HERITAGE TRUST LTD Received: On time
Dr James Maxwell Guthrie Moir Trustee 10 February 2019
THE BUCKINGHAMSHIRE HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST Received: On time