JACARI

Charity number: 1177211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSANNAH PERKS Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Ilan Elson-Schwab Trustee 12 December 2020 None on record
Dr Sofia Latif Trustee 22 September 2021 None on record
MS CHRISTINA McCullagh Trustee 01 February 2018 None on record
Imran Mirza Trustee 01 June 2017 None on record
Matthew Lister Chair 10 June 2018 None on record
Elizabeth Roberts Trustee 14 December 2019 None on record
Kate Newby Trustee 10 June 2021 None on record
Suzanne Louise Sykes Trustee 10 March 2021
SAVE A CHILD Received: On time