Accounts and annual returns LANGUAGE IN THE COMMUNITY
Charity number: 1177706

Charity reporting is overdue by 185 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 185 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 185 days | |
Annual return | 30 January 2021 | 04 December 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2021 | 04 December 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2020 | 04 December 2021 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2020 | 04 December 2021 | 369 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 January 2019 | 04 December 2021 | 735 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2019 | 04 December 2021 | 735 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window