Trustees THE UNITED CHURCH OF ST MARK

Charity number: 1176784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLIN VICTOR BATTY Chair 15 April 2018
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
AGE CONCERN (BANSTEAD)
Received: On time
Emma Louise Sears Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
LIZ TOWNSEND Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
MEL BRACEY Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
ROSALYN HAZEL BIRCH Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
KEITH NELSON Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
MARK FREDERICK ROBINSON Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
DAVID ALAN WILLOCK Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
JANET LINDA WILLOCK Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
SHEILA BATTY Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Martin David Trenaman Trustee 30 April 2017
EPSOM MALE VOICE CHOIR
Received: On time
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JOHN WILLIAM MILLER Trustee 30 April 2017
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Desmond Carl Williamson Trustee 30 April 2017
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time