EASTBRIDGE HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1177727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 December 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 February 2021 117 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 November 2019 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 January 2020 89 days late Download