Financial history HIGH LEGH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £56.06k £50.57k £36.05k £44.12k £34.29k
Total expenditure £75.46k £42.16k £36.01k £35.86k £19.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k N/A N/A £10.00k £19.37k