Trustees MIDLAND INSTITUTE OF MINING ENGINEERS
Charity number: 1177100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Fowler CEng FIMMM | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Strugnell CEng FIMMM | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Antony Murrell CEng MIMMM | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dixon CEng FIMMM | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bradley CEng FIMMM | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JAMES STRAW FIMMM | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Carley FIMMM | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John James Hind CEng FIMMM | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Klinkenberg FIMMM | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Tinsley CEng FIMMM | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Stuart Walker CEng MIMMM | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Jackson CEng MIMMM | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Lowery CEng FIMMM | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hetherington CEng FIMMM | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peredur Wyn Griffith CEng FIMMM | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Stewart Rawson CEng FIMMM | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.