Accounts and annual returns MIDDLE STREET SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1176330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 December 2018 15 January 2020 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 December 2018 15 January 2020 102 days late Download Open in new window