Accounts and annual returns SAVE THE LIFE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1176683
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 February 2023 375 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 August 2021 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 August 2021 204 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 October 2020 260 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 October 2020 260 days late Download Open in new window