Financial history TYDD ST MARY PLAYING FIELD COMMITTEE

Charity number: 511472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2017 04/04/2018 04/04/2019 04/04/2020 04/04/2021
Total gross income £17.29k £9.65k £9.66k £10.20k £22.10k
Total expenditure £19.38k £11.36k £8.51k £9.46k £20.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k