Accounts and annual returns MOUNTAIN MOVERS

Charity number: 1176708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 25 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 June 2019 09 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2019 09 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window