ELRHA

Charity number: 1177110
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Marta Tufet Bayona Trustee 07 May 2021 None on record
WENDY LYN FENTON Trustee 12 February 2018
LIVESTOCK EMERGENCY GUIDELINES AND STANDARDS - LEGS Received: On time
Ebrima Saidy Trustee 18 February 2021 None on record
Andrew Katz Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
MATTHEW DERMOT CLANCY Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
Andrew Toby Smith Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record
Margaret Workman Buchanan-Smith Trustee 12 July 2019 None on record
ANDREW JOHN SHELLARD Trustee 12 February 2018 None on record
Karen Evelyn Twining Fooks Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record