Accounts and annual returns THE ROTARY CLUB OF ROMSEY TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1177058
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 212 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 277 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window