BELMONT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1177041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mandy Stagg Trustee 08 June 2019 None on record
PATRICK CONWAY Trustee 07 February 2018 None on record
JOSEPH KNIGHT Trustee 07 February 2018
LAUREL AVENUE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Amy Wilson Trustee 14 July 2021 None on record
Erika Denholm Trustee 25 May 2019 None on record
PETER CORBETT Trustee 07 February 2018 None on record
MICHAEL PHILIP BENNETT Trustee 07 February 2018 None on record
Stephen Laverick Trustee 11 September 2019 None on record
Anne Corbett Trustee 01 June 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, BELMONT Received: On time
BELMONT EDUCATION TRUST Overdue by 33 days