ALEXANDER SHTIEBEL

Charity number: 1177368
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 29 September 2019 On time Download