Trustees BANGOR UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1177930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nyah Lowe | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
David Rhys Wilton | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Elizabeth Edwards | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lily Theresa Swain | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nida Ambreen | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stef Finikin | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Jack Dickins | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Thompson | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hefin Celt John | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Lucy Timson-Sheppard | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraint Owen Pugh | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|||||
John Michael Slater | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.