Accounts and annual returns West Yorkshire Hardship Project

Charity number: 1179305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 23 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 July 2019 07 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2019 25 June 2020 26 days late Download Open in new window