Trustees BOLDON AND CLEADON COMMUNITY LIBRARY
Charity number: 1177203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Docherty | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN CUCCHI | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Val Scott | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Mallen | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Jean Heaton | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
GAIL ANN BARKEL | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE WATSON | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.