Trustees NNLS DESTITUTE ASYLUM SEEKERS DROP IN
Charity number: 1177599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN KARET | Chair | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Michael Lachmann | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Forster | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roma Felstein | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Thome | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Meira Blumberg | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Elliott | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RAFF | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MILDRED LEVISON | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICKIE BURMAN | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.