Accounts and annual returns SUVAI DEAF EAST COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1180055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 July 2020 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 September 2020 237 days late Download Open in new window