THE NATURIST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Joanne Howells Trustee 26 July 2014 None on record
Patricia Frances Mills Trustee 21 March 2015 None on record
Stephen Paul Paton Trustee 19 September 2021 None on record
PATRICIA MARY CONNELL Chair 12 March 1994
THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS' CHURCH, DERSINGHAM Received: On time
Thomas Martin Hall Trustee 18 March 2020 None on record