Financial history WITTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511789
Charity reporting is overdue by 1634 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £2.55k £5.77k £21.79k £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.39k £3.61k £4.23k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A