Accounts and annual returns GUINEA-BISSAU SUPPORT LINKS

Charity number: 1178726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2021 05 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2021 05 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2020 05 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 05 February 2021 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2019 02 May 2020 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2019 02 May 2020 93 days late Download Open in new window