Trustees APAC

Charity number: 1180988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ERIN ALLISON MORRISON LEE Chair 09 May 2017
None on record
Malcolm Mathieson Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Sian Williams Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Jill Sullivan Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Philip Boot Trustee 28 April 2021
None on record
Bethany Johnstone Trustee 28 April 2021
None on record
PATRICIA UNDERWOOD Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
ROBYN GREENWOOD Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
Clare Germaine Bunkham Wood Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
LIZ HARPER Trustee 12 May 2016
None on record
BIDDY HAYWARD Trustee 21 April 2015
THE THEATRICAL GUILD
Received: On time