Trustees TEVERSAL CRICKET CLUB
Charity number: 1181875
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Callum Else | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Elston | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Hewitt | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daran Hewitt | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Blaine Stewart Maloney-Donaldson | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gregory | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HAUTON | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH SELWOOD | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GREGSON | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
FRED HICKTON | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MURBY | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.