Accounts and annual returns SOUTH WEST ASBESTOS SUPPORT & AWARENESS GROUP CIO

Charity number: 1178353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 09 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 09 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 19 April 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 19 April 2021 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 21 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window