Accounts and annual returns Hope Church

Charity number: 1178345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window