Accounts and annual returns THE SOUTH WEST FOOD COLLECTIVE

Charity number: 1179238
Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 115 days
Annual return 29 April 2022 29 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2022 29 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 April 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2021 29 July 2022 151 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 April 2020 24 January 2022 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2020 29 July 2022 516 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 April 2019 29 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2019 29 July 2022 881 days late Download Open in new window