THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WROTHAM

Charity number: 1177875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Norman Bourne Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Sue Smith Trustee 19 November 2019 None on record
Mary Houghton Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
PAULINE DOROTHY SMITH Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
SANDIE CHAPMAN Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Rev EDWARD MAURICE ALEXANDERSON WRIGHT Chair 02 September 2015
THE CEDARS FOUNDATION Received: On time
INN CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES Received: On time
KATHY WIFFEN Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
CAROLYN HEATHER BEACH Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
LINDA ROBERTA READ Trustee 26 April 2017
THE FRIENDS OF ST. GEORGE'S CHURCH , WROTHAM Received: On time
MARLEEN HARVEY-KELLY Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Greg Fraser Forsyth Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Patricia Anne Bradshaw Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Margaret Caroline Garlinge Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record