THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT EDMUND, CHINGFORD

Charity number: 1178139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL WILLIAM BLISS Trustee 17 April 2011 None on record
Rev James Bernard Gilder MA Trustee 14 July 2019 None on record
CHERYL CATHERINE DAVID Trustee 08 April 2018 None on record
PAULINE ESTHER SETCHFIELD Trustee 13 April 1977 None on record
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH SETCHFIELD Trustee 27 April 2003 None on record
Rev LESLEY ANNE GOLDSMITH B.A. Chair 24 June 2008 None on record
Amanda Elise Margaret Harrison Trustee 20 September 2020 None on record
Elizabeth Charlotte N Skinner Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
PATRICK ARCHER Trustee 08 April 2018 None on record
DEBORAH RUTH WATSON B.ED. Trustee 24 April 2002
SOUTH CHINGFORD DISTRICT, GIRLGUIDING Received: On time
GEORGE ALFRED DUBERRY Trustee 13 April 2014 None on record
COLIN FREDERICK JAMES SETCHFIELD B.A. Trustee 24 April 2002 None on record
Catherine Celeste Greenidge Trustee 28 March 2021 None on record
Doris Afua Albrecht Trustee 13 June 2018 None on record
John Sidney White Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
JOHN GEORGE GLOVER Trustee 24 March 2013 None on record
Mol Patricia Matheson Trustee 20 September 2020 None on record
ANDREW JOHN EDWARD SETCHFIELD Trustee 24 April 2002 None on record