Accounts and annual returns MUIRTON ATHLETIC CHARITABLE HUB
Charity number: 1179984
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 10 July 2023 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 10 July 2023 | 159 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 13 August 2022 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 13 August 2022 | 193 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | 30 July 2020 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | 30 July 2020 | 180 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window