Financial history LICHFIELD AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £15.53k £30.26k £7.63k £3.04k £9.59k
Total expenditure £18.10k £33.74k £7.05k £4.36k £10.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A