HEATHROW COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1183004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Keeley Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
David Cottrell Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Gennie Dearman Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
Dr PRABHJOT BASRA Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
ANDY KERSWILL Chair 12 June 2019 None on record
RICHARD DE BELDER Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
MICHAEL MURPHY Trustee 18 April 2018 None on record
SAMINA HUSSAIN Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
Aled Patchett Trustee 13 May 2021 None on record
Jason Knight Trustee 11 February 2021 None on record