Trustees THE FRIENDS OF THE SIERRA LEONE NATIONAL RAILWAY MUSEUM

Charity number: 1179579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Margaret Ashby Chair 24 May 2014
WELSHPOOL AND LLANFAIR LIGHT RAILWAY PRESERVATION CO. LIMITED
Received: On time
1ST ACOMB (YORK) BOYS' BRIGADE
Received: On time
THE BAHAMAS LOCOMOTIVE SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
Christopher Michael Whitehouse Trustee 11 January 2022
None on record
Iain McCall Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
Christopher McKenna Trustee 05 October 2019
None on record
FRANCIS PATERSON MBE Trustee 24 May 2018
None on record
Sir Philip Williams Bart Trustee 19 May 2018
None on record
William David Bickers-Jones Trustee 03 June 2017
WELSHPOOL AND LLANFAIR LIGHT RAILWAY PRESERVATION CO. LIMITED
Received: On time
STEVE DAVIES Trustee 24 May 2014
THE DUKE OF LANCASTER'S REGIMENT LANCASHIRE INFANTRY MUSEUM
Received: On time
BALA LAKE RAILWAY TRUST
Received: On time
THE ARMY MUSEUMS OGILBY CIO
Recently registered
THE A1 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST
Received: On time
ANTHONY JOHN COULLS Trustee 24 May 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BISHOP AUCKLAND
Received: On time