Accounts and annual returns ST IVES SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity number: 1181304
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 29 days
Annual return 04 April 2022 07 June 2023 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 07 June 2023 123 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2021 02 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 02 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2020 01 February 2022 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 01 February 2022 362 days late Download Open in new window