Financial history BURY JUBILEE OUTDOOR PURSUITS CENTRE FUND

Charity number: 512292
Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £25.90k £23.10k £19.40k £11.80k £20.16k
Total expenditure £19.04k £22.52k £60.30k £10.22k £14.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £11.00k £8.34k