Trustees MADELEY AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)
Charity number: 1180332
Charity reporting is overdue by 58 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roy Gadsden | Chair | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIET COLLINS | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BUTTERY | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ILLINGWORTH | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE CLITHEROE | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wood | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Bloor | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LESLIE WILCOX | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Paul Chase | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET HAWKSLEY | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARGARET POLWART | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
GLENDA KATHERINE HELENA MILLER | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.