MARLBOROUGH SCIENCE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1178697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required