Financial history BARNSTON PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 512337
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £49.23k £42.67k £22.74k £9.07k £5.59k
Total expenditure £44.22k £37.43k £34.04k £9.80k £4.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A