Accounts and annual returns PTA OF SACRED HEART RC PRIMARY SCHOOL BATTERSEA

Charity number: 1179266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 July 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 July 2021 374 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required